EP4248251 - HIGH DENSITY,LOW DIAMETER CABLE WITH ROLLABLE FIBER OPTIC RIBBON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Research & Development Corporation One Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERBACH, Gerhard 96465 Neustadt bie Coburg / DE | 02 /
OLSZEWSKI, Sebastian 95-070 Lodz / PL | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph Patentanwälte Sturm Weilnau Franke Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 (Haus C-Süd) 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 21895369.3 | 10.11.2021 | [2023/39] | WO2021US58710 | Priority number, date | US202063115836P | 19.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063115836 P | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022108796 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4248251 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
G02B6/4403 (EP);
G02B6/4432 (US);
G02B6/44384 (EP,US);
G02B6/4486 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | KABEL MIT HOHER DICHTE UND GERINGEM DURCHMESSER UND AUFROLLBARES GLASFASERBAND | [2023/39] | English: | HIGH DENSITY,LOW DIAMETER CABLE WITH ROLLABLE FIBER OPTIC RIBBON | [2023/39] | French: | CÂBLE À HAUTE DENSITÉ ET À FAIBLE DIAMÈTRE POURVU D'UN RUBAN DE FIBRES OPTIQUES ENROULABLE | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US7050688 (LOCHKOVIC GREGORY A [US], et al); | [XY]US2017235068 (DEBBAN HAROLD P [US], et al); | [Y]EP3514593 (STERLITE TECH LTD [IN]); | [Y]US2020142144 (BLAZER BRADLEY JEROME [US], et al) |