EP4248153 - DEVICES FOR SHAPING CLEAR ICE PRODUCTS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abstract Ice, Inc. 755 Southpoint Blvd., Suite A Petaluma, CA 94954 / US | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOTANEY, Ashok Kumar San Francisco, CA 94121 / US | 02 /
STEVENSON, Todd Novato, CA 94945 / US | 03 /
WHALEN, Andrew Windsor, CA 95492 / US | 04 /
PETERSON, Bryce Edmund Hayward, CA 94545 / US | 05 /
CLAUSON, Luke W. Reno, NV 89511 / US | 06 /
NEWELL, Matthew Byrnes Reno, NV 89519 / US | 07 /
RECTOR, Thomas Michael Gardnerville, NV 89410 / US | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Doherty, William, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 21895651.4 | 19.11.2021 | [2023/39] | WO2021US60039 | Priority number, date | US202063116453P | 20.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063116453 P | US202163276509P | 05.11.2021 Original published format: US 202163276509 P | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022109237 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4248153 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F25C1/24, F25C1/04, F25C1/22, F25C1/25, F25C5/20, F25D11/02 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
F25C5/14 (EP,US);
F25C1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM FORMEN VON KLAREISPRODUKTEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2023/39] | English: | DEVICES FOR SHAPING CLEAR ICE PRODUCTS AND RELATED METHODS | [2023/39] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE MISE EN FORME DE PRODUITS DE GLACE TRANSPARENTS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5187948 (FROHBIETER EDWIN H [US]); | [A]US2014165598 (BOARMAN PATRICK J [US], et al); | [A]US9476629 (BOARMAN PATRICK J [US]); | [A]US9784492 (LITTLE PATRICK WILLIAM [US], et al); | [A]US2020158402 (KIM YONGHYUN [KR], et al) |