EP4239984 - SHAPE MEMORY ALLOY MOTOR, MOTOR MODULE, CAMERA MODULE, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Dong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Deliang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Le Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Gang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21897115.8 | 26.11.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021CN133364 | Priority number, date | CN202011367723 | 28.11.2020 Original published format: CN202011367723 | [2023/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022111615 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4239984 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04N23/52, H04N23/55, H04N23/57 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
H04N23/55 (EP,CN,US);
H04M1/0264 (EP,CN);
H04N23/57 (EP,CN,US);
G03B3/10 (EP);
G03B30/00 (EP);
H04M1/02 (US);
H04M1/026 (CN);
H04N23/52 (EP);
H04N25/617 (EP,CN);
G03B2205/0076 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/36] | H04M1/02, H04N5/225, H04N5/357 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | MOTOR AUS EINER FORMGEDÄCHTNISLEGIERUNG, MOTORMODUL, KAMERAMODUL UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/36] | English: | SHAPE MEMORY ALLOY MOTOR, MOTOR MODULE, CAMERA MODULE, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/36] | French: | MOTEUR EN ALLIAGE À MÉMOIRE DE FORME, MODULE DE MOTEUR, MODULE DE CAMÉRA, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2023 | Translation filed | 30.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN109495679 (SHANGHAI XINMAI ELECTRONIC TECH CO LTD); | [X]US2020277941 (EDDINGTON ROBIN [GB], et al); | [A]WO2020228392 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | US2022196967 [ ] (DAI JIAZHI [CN], et al) |