EP4251175 - ADIPOGENIC CELL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flagship Pioneering, Inc. 55 Cambridge Parkway 8th Floor, Suite 800E Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE BOER, Alexandra, Sophie Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 02 /
NGO, Le P. Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 03 /
KAHVEJIAN, Avak Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 04 /
LEWANDOWSKI, Jordan Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 21899119.8 | 24.11.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021US60831 | Priority number, date | US202063118226P | 25.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063118226 P | US202063118237P | 25.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063118237 P | US202063118235P | 25.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063118235 P | US202063118232P | 25.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063118232 P | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022115609 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4251175 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/12, A61K35/28, A61K35/35, A61L27/00, A61P17/00, A61P43/00 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
A61L27/3804 (EP,KR);
A61K35/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/35 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/1816 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/44 (EP,KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR);
A61L27/3834 (EP,KR);
A61L27/54 (EP,KR);
A61P17/00 (EP,KR);
A61P43/00 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0653 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0665 (US);
C12N9/0071 (EP,KR);
C12Y114/16001 (EP,US);
A61L2300/64 (EP,KR);
C12N2501/145 (EP,KR);
C12N2501/22 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2501/2303 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2501/26 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2501/33 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2501/39 (EP,KR);
C12N2506/11 (EP,KR);
C12N2506/1369 (US);
C12N2506/1384 (EP,KR);
C12N2510/00 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | ADIPOGENE ZELLZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2023/40] | English: | ADIPOGENIC CELL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2023/40] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE CELLULES ADIPOGÉNIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 15.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008095750 (GIMBLE JEFFREY M [US], et al); | [Y]US2011038923 (WEISINGER GARY [IL], et al); | [X]US2011268708 (LIN CHING SHWUN [US], et al); | [A]US2012315254 (HAMED SAHER [IL]); | [A]US9062288 (VESEY GRAHAM [AU]); | [Y]US2016187317 (SUGI SHIGEKI [SG], et al); | [XY]US2017258851 (BRAVO EDUARDO [ES], et al); | [A]WO2019173435 (EPIBONE INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2020016400 (FISHER PAUL [US], et al); | [A]WO2020064793 (BONE THERAPEUTICS SA [BE]); |