EP4258699 - POSITION DETERMINING METHOD AND APPARATUS AND INTERNET-OF-VEHICLES DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datang Gohigh Intelligent and Connected Technology (Chongqing) Co., Ltd. No. 35 (10-01 To 10-04, 10-5-01, 10-5-2, 10-6) of JingHe Road, HuXi Street, High-tech District Chongqing 400040 / CN | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Rui Beijing 100191 / CN | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/41] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 21899811.0 | 08.11.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021CN129333 | Priority number, date | CN202011387718 | 02.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011387718 | [2023/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022116777 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4258699 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/76, H04L5/00, H04W4/02, H04W4/44, H04W40/24, H04W64/00, H04W84/00, H04W92/18 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
G01S13/765 (EP);
H04W64/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/40 (CN,KR);
H04L5/0048 (EP,KR,US);
H04W16/10 (CN);
H04W24/08 (KR);
H04W28/0231 (CN);
H04W4/02 (CN);
H04W4/025 (EP);
H04W4/44 (EP);
H04W40/20 (CN);
H04W40/244 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (KR);
H04W72/1263 (KR);
H04W72/25 (KR);
H04W72/542 (KR);
H04W92/18 (EP,KR);
H04W4/023 (EP);
H04W84/005 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | H04W4/02, H04W4/40, H04W16/10, H04W28/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | POSITIONSBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE INTERNET-DER-FAHRZEUGE-VORRICHTUNG | [2023/41] | English: | POSITION DETERMINING METHOD AND APPARATUS AND INTERNET-OF-VEHICLES DEVICE | [2023/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTERMINATION DE POSITION, ET DISPOSITIF DE L'INTERNET DES VÉHICULES | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2023 | Translation filed | 01.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2019122080 (OCADO INNOVATION LTD [GB]) |