EP4239313 - DELAYED FRACTURE CHARACTERISTIC EVALUATION METHOD AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUKI Yuichi Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
SHINMIYA Toyohisa Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
NAKAGAWA Kinya Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 04 /
YAMASAKI Yuji Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21900254.0 | 29.07.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021JP28096 | Priority number, date | JP20200201289 | 03.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020201289 | [2023/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022118497 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4239313 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01N17/00, G01N3/20, G06F30/10, G06F30/23 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
G01N3/20 (EP,KR,US);
G01N17/00 (EP,KR);
G06F30/10 (KR);
G06F30/15 (EP);
G06F30/23 (EP,KR);
G01N2203/0023 (EP,KR);
G01N2203/006 (KR);
G01N2203/0064 (US);
G01N2203/0066 (EP);
G01N2203/0067 (US);
G01N2203/0218 (EP,KR);
G01N2203/0236 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2203/0282 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/2025 (EP);
G06F2113/24 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM ZUR BEURTEILUNG VON VERZÖGERTEN BRUCHEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2023/36] | English: | DELAYED FRACTURE CHARACTERISTIC EVALUATION METHOD AND PROGRAM | [2023/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME D'ÉVALUATION DE CARACTÉRISTIQUE DE CASSURE RETARDÉE | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2023 | Translation filed | 02.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 18.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP6610607B | International search | [A]JP2005205467 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-16 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2010069533 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1, 7-10, 16 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2010071734 (POLYPLASTICS CO) [A] 1-16 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2010127933 (LIVERMORE SOFTWARE TECH CORP) [A] 2-9, 11-16 * paragraphs [0026]-[0057] *; | [A]JP2012033039 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-16* entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2014170318 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) [A] 2-9, 11-16 * paragraphs [0024]-[0070], fig. 1-9 *; | [A]JP2015004596 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0024]-[0049], fig. 1-7 *; | [A]JP2019020332 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) [A] 1, 7-10, 16 * paragraphs [0011]-[0056], fig. 2 * |