EP4257876 - LIGHT-GUIDING BODY FIXATION STRUCTURE AND VEHICLE LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ichikoh Industries, Ltd. 80 Itado Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1192 / JP | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WADA Seito Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1192 / JP | 02 /
ABE Shintaro Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1192 / JP | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21900643.4 | 01.12.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021JP44120 | Priority number, date | JP20200199743 | 01.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020199743 | JP20210194721 | 30.11.2021 Original published format: JP 2021194721 | [2023/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022118892 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4257876 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F21W104/00, F21S41/24, F21S41/29, F21S43/237, F21S43/241, F21S43/245, F21S43/27, F21W102/10, F21W103/10, F21W103/20, F21W103/55 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
F21S43/237 (EP);
F21S41/24 (US);
F21S41/19 (US);
F21S41/29 (US);
F21S43/195 (EP);
F21S43/245 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSSTRUKTUR FÜR LICHTLEITENDEN KÖRPER UND FAHRZEUGLAMPE | [2023/41] | English: | LIGHT-GUIDING BODY FIXATION STRUCTURE AND VEHICLE LAMP | [2023/41] | French: | STRUCTURE DE FIXATION DE CORPS DE GUIDAGE DE LUMIÈRE ET LAMPE DE VÉHICULE | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2023 | Translation filed | 30.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202006003392U (FER FAHRZEUGELEKTRIK GMBH [DE]); | [A]CN203771297U (FOSHAN ICHIKOH VALEO AUTO LIGHTING SYSTEMS CO LTD); | [A]EP2775197 (VALEO VISION BELGIQUE [BE]); | [YA]EP2977672 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]CN205991415U (SHANGHAI KOITO AUTOMOTIVE LAMP); | [Y]CN110285383 (CHANGZHOU XINGYU AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING SYSTEMS CO LTD) | International search | [A]JP2006114309 (KOITO MFG CO LTD); | [A]JP2015064996 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2015219995 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD); | [A]JP2016100257 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD) | by applicant | JP2015018611 | JP2019145327 |