EP4255659 - THREAD-CUTTING DIE HEAD FOR POWERED PIPE THREADER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation 13135 West Lisbon Road Brookfield, WI 53202 / US | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLF, Matthew, R. Milwaukee, WI 53202 / US | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21901297.8 | 30.11.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021US61077 | Priority number, date | US202063119973P | 01.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063119973 P | US202163241134P | 07.09.2021 Original published format: US 202163241134 P | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022119791 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4255659 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23G5/10, B23G1/22 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
B23G5/12 (EP,US);
B23G1/24 (EP,US);
B23G5/083 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | GEWINDESCHNEIDKOPF FÜR ANGETRIEBENEN ROHREINFÄDLER | [2023/41] | English: | THREAD-CUTTING DIE HEAD FOR POWERED PIPE THREADER | [2023/41] | French: | TÊTE DE FILIÈRE POUR FILETEUSE MOTORISÉE DE TUYAUX | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 11.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4370770 (WAGNER RUDOLF [DE]); | [Y]EP0249184 ; | [Y]EP0569320 (EMERSON ELECTRIC CO [US]); | [A]CN101704141 (HANGZHOU HONGLI PIPE MACHINERY); | [XY]CN206084041U (SHAOXING LONGHUA TOOLS CO LTD) |