EP4255300 - NERVE STIMULATION PATTERNS AND DEVICE FOR DETECTABILITY OF NERVE FUNCTION AND HEALTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Checkpoint Surgical, Inc. 22901 Millcreek Boulevard Cleveland, Ohio 44122 / US | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COTTRILL, Ben Cleveland, Ohio 44122 / US | 02 /
WALKER, Eric R. Berea, Ohio 44017 / US | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21901374.5 | 01.12.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021US61388 | Priority number, date | US202063119683P | 01.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063119683 P | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022119912 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4255300 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/316 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
A61B5/388 (EP,US);
A61B5/294 (EP,US);
A61B5/1104 (EP);
A61B5/296 (EP);
A61B5/6833 (EP);
A61B5/6848 (US);
A61B5/6877 (EP);
A61B5/7435 (EP);
A61B2505/05 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | NERVENSTIMULATIONSMUSTER UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG DER NERVENFUNKTION UND -GESUNDHEIT | [2023/41] | English: | NERVE STIMULATION PATTERNS AND DEVICE FOR DETECTABILITY OF NERVE FUNCTION AND HEALTH | [2023/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET SCHÉMAS DE STIMULATION PERMETTANT LA DÉTECTION DE L'ÉTAT DE SANTÉ ET DE LA FONCTION DES NERFS | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 08.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010228313 (STARKEBAUM WARREN L [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * Entire document. *; | [A]US2010274312 (ALATARIS KONSTANTINOS [US], et al) [A] 1-21* Entire document. *; | [XY]US2016158550 (HOU WENBO [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13-21 * Entire document. * [Y] 11-12; | [Y]WO2020097500 (CHECKPOINT SURGICAL INC [US]) [Y] 11-12 * Entire document. * |