EP4260870 - PRAME BINDING MOLECULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mie University 1577, Kurimamachiya-cho Tsu-shi, Mie 514-8507 / JP | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIKU, Hiroshi Tsu-shi, Mie 514-8507 / JP | 02 /
AKAHORI, Yasushi Tsu-shi, Mie 514-8507 / JP | 03 /
HIRATSUKA, Hiroyuki Tsu-shi, Mie 514-8507 / JP | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21901679.7 | 07.12.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021JP44807 | Priority number, date | JP20200205384 | 10.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020205384 | [2023/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022124282 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4260870 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K48/00, A61P35/00, C07K14/725, C07K16/30, C07K19/00, C12N5/10, C12N1/15, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N15/12, C12N15/13, C12N15/62, A61K35/17 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/30 (KR);
A61K39/46449 (US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2239/57 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4632 (US);
A61K39/464412 (EP);
A61K39/464489 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/3053 (EP);
C07K16/32 (US);
C12N15/86 (US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,US);
C40B40/10 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR);
A61K2239/46 (EP);
C07K2317/34 (EP);
C07K2317/56 (EP);
C07K2317/565 (EP);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP);
C07K2319/03 (EP,US);
C12N2510/00 (EP);
C12N2740/10043 (US);
C12N2740/13043 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | PRAME-BINDENDES MOLEKÜL | [2023/42] | English: | PRAME BINDING MOLECULE | [2023/42] | French: | MOLÉCULE DE LIAISON À PRAME | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2023 | Translation filed | 05.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2016191246 (MEMORIAL SLOAN KETTERING CANCER CENTER [US], et al); | [Y]CN106478809 (XIANGXUE PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD); |