EP4258671 - POINT CLOUD ATTRIBUTE PREDICTING METHOD, ENCODER, DECODER, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Wenjie Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21902357.9 | 18.11.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021CN131346 | Priority number, date | CN202011439503 | 07.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011439503 | [2023/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022121650 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4258671 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/597, G06T9/00 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
G06T9/001 (EP);
H04N19/42 (CN,US);
H04N19/597 (CN,US);
G06T9/004 (EP);
H04N13/15 (CN);
H04N13/161 (CN);
H04N19/136 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE VON PUNKTWOLKENATTRIBUTEN, CODIERER, DECODIERER UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/41] | English: | POINT CLOUD ATTRIBUTE PREDICTING METHOD, ENCODER, DECODER, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION D'ATTRIBUT DE NUAGE DE POINTS, CODEUR, DÉCODEUR ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2023 | Translation filed | 07.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 10.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - ANONYMOUS, "G-PCC codec description", no. n19525, (20201010), pages 1 - 140, 131. MPEG MEETING; 20200629 - 20200703; ONLINE; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: https://dms.mpeg.expert/doc_end_user/documents/131_OnLine/wg11/w19525.zip w19525.docx, (20201010), XP030292244 [I] 1-15 * page 6; figure 1 * * page 78, paragraph 3.8.9 * * page 8, paragraphs 3.13, 3.2 * | [A] - SEHOON YEA ET AL, "[G-PCC] [New Proposal] Interframe Prediction for Attribute Coding", no. m47838, (20190327), 126. MPEG MEETING; 20190325 - 20190329; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/126_Geneva/wg11/m47838-v4-m47838.zip m47838r2.docx, (20190327), XP030212154 [A] 1-15 * pages 1-3 * |