EP4162815 - SWEETENING LIQUID CAPABLE OF PREVENTING AND RELIEVING INTESTINAL SUGAR ALCOHOL INTOLERANCE, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 27.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Huakang Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 18 Huagong Road, Huabu Town, Kaihua Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUO, Qile Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Feifei Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Xuan Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 04 /
CHENG, Xinping Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 05 /
LI, Mian Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 06 /
SHI, Lihua Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 07 /
ZHANG, Wenyao Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 08 /
WANG, Yuan Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21902446.0 | 30.11.2021 | [2023/15] | WO2021CN134591 | Priority number, date | CN202011419420 | 07.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011419420 | [2023/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022121739 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4162815 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A23L33/125, A21D13/06, A21D2/18, A23L2/60, A23L29/231, A23L29/238, A23L29/256, A23L29/262, A23L29/30 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
A23L33/125 (EP,CN,US);
A23L27/34 (US);
A21D13/06 (CN);
A21D2/18 (CN);
A21D2/181 (CN);
A21D2/183 (CN);
A23L2/02 (EP);
A23L2/60 (EP,CN);
A23L2/72 (EP);
A23L29/231 (EP,US);
A23L29/238 (EP,US);
A23L29/256 (EP,US);
A23L29/262 (EP);
A23L29/37 (EP);
A23L33/40 (US);
A23V2002/00 (CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/32, A23V2250/5072, A23V2250/5036, A23V2250/507, A23V2250/6422, A23V2250/6416, A23V2250/642, A23V2250/51082, A23V2300/14 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2023/15] | A23L33/125, A21D13/06, A21D2/18, A23L2/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | SÜSSSTOFFFLÜSSIGKEIT ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND LINDERUNG DER INTESTINALEN ZUCKERALKOHOLUNVERTRÄGLICHKEIT SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/15] | English: | SWEETENING LIQUID CAPABLE OF PREVENTING AND RELIEVING INTESTINAL SUGAR ALCOHOL INTOLERANCE, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2023/15] | French: | LIQUIDE ÉDULCORANT POUVANT PRÉVENIR ET SOULAGER L'INTOLÉRANCE INTESTINALE À L'ALCOOL DE SUCRE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON APPLICATION | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2023 | Translation filed | 09.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 30.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP4071818B ; | [Y]EP3132693 (SAN-EI GEN F F I INC [JP]); | [Y]CN107616984 (JIANGSU XIHONG BIOLOGY MEDICINE CO LTD); | [Y]EP3473258 (OTSUKA PHARMA FACTORY INC [JP]); | [IY]CN110357986 (YANG XIAOJUN); |