EP4219828 - METHOD FOR PREPARING BACTERIOSTATIC HOUSEHOLD PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Jingxing Paper Joint Stock Co., Ltd. No.1 Jingxing Road Caoqiao Town Pinghu, Zhejiang 314214 / CN | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Haibing Town Pinghu, Zhejiang 314214 / CN | 02 /
AN, Xingye Town Pinghu, Zhejiang 314214 / CN | 03 /
XU, Dong Town Pinghu, Zhejiang 314214 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Hongbin Town Pinghu, Zhejiang 314214 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Runqing Town Pinghu, Zhejiang 314214 / CN | 06 /
LU, Bin Town Pinghu, Zhejiang 314214 / CN | 07 /
DONG, Hongming Town Pinghu, Zhejiang 314214 / CN | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | karo IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Steinstraße 16-18 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/31] | karo IP karo IP Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels PartG mbB Postfach 32 01 02 40416 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 21902675.4 | 09.12.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021CN136642 | Priority number, date | CN202011454151 | 10.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011454151 | [2023/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022121970 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4219828 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | D21H27/00, D21H21/36, D21H17/11, D21H11/00, D21F13/00, D21H25/02, C12Q1/18, G01N1/28, C12R1/19 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
D21H21/36 (EP,CN);
D21H27/005 (CN);
C12Q1/18 (EP,CN);
D21F13/00 (CN);
D21H11/00 (CN);
D21H17/11 (EP,CN);
D21H25/02 (EP,CN);
D21H27/002 (EP);
G01N1/28 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BAKTERIOSTATISCHEM HAUSHALTSPAPIER | [2023/31] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING BACTERIOSTATIC HOUSEHOLD PAPER | [2023/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE PAPIER MÉNAGER BACTÉRIOSTATIQUE | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2023 | Translation filed | 26.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 18.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN104667267 (XUZHOU VOCATIONAL COLLEGE OF BIOENGINEERING) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0040] *; | [Y]CN104977387 (ECONOMIC CROPS RES INST OF SHANXI ACADEMY OF AGRICULTURAL SCIENCES) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0015] *; | [Y]CN108042809 (UNIV NANJING FORESTRY) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] *; | [A]CN110219207 (FUJIAN YUCHENG ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-9* claims 1-8 *; | [Y]CN111467283 (JINING CENTURY MICROBES BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0048] *; | [Y] - SIDDIQUI SHARF ILAHI ET AL, "Nigella sativa plant based nanocomposite-MnFe2O4/BC: An antibacterial material for water purification", JOURNAL OF CLEANER PRODUCTION, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20180803), vol. 200, doi:10.1016/J.JCLEPRO.2018.07.300, ISSN 0959-6526, pages 996 - 1008, XP085453166 [Y] 1-9 * page 998, paragraph 2nd * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jclepro.2018.07.300 |