EP4245569 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | 09.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOFUE, Naoya Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIZUMI, Takuma Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 21902958.4 | 17.09.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021JP34319 | Priority number, date | JP20200202671 | 07.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020202671 | [2023/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022123854 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4245569 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/00, B60C19/00 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
B60C23/0493 (EP,US);
B60C1/00 (US);
B60C19/00 (EP,US);
B29D2030/0072 (EP);
B60C2200/04 (US);
Y02T10/86 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | REIFEN | [2023/38] | English: | TIRE | [2023/38] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2023 | Translation filed | 12.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2008149864 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-12 * fig. 1-4 *; | [A]WO2009056740 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * fig. 1-6 *; | [A]JP2018512333 (COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN) [A] 1-12 * fig. 1-4 *; | [A]WO2019054213 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-12 * claims, examples 1-8 *; | [A]JP2019064543 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-12 * claims, paragraphs [0025」, [0026], fig. 1-7 *; | [A]JP2019077296 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-12* claims, example 1 *; | [A]WO2020022160 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * fig. 1-4 *; | [A]JP2020026268 (HANKOOK TIRE & TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * fig. 1-7 *; | [A]JP2020040466 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-12 * fig. 1-5 *; | [A]JP2020082934 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * claims, examples 1-7, fig. 1-8 * | by applicant | US4414370 | JPS596207 | US5010166 | JPH0558805 | JP2007313522 | JP2010111753 | JP2018016185 | JP2018199396 | JP2019023594 | JP2019026218 | - Toa Synthetic Research Annual Report TREND2000, no. 3, pages 42 - 45 |