EP4201632 - ELECTRONIC COMPONENT-EQUIPPED RESIN CASING AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissha Co., Ltd. 3, Mibu Hanai-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIGUCHI, Chuzo Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | 02 /
SASAKI, Jun Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | 03 /
KAWASHIMA, Eiji Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | 04 /
TAKINISHI, Yasuisa Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21903085.5 | 09.11.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021JP41109 | Priority number, date | JP20200202467 | 07.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020202467 | [2023/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022123981 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4201632 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, // B29L31/34 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
B29C45/14655 (EP);
H04R1/025 (US);
B29C45/14065 (EP);
H04R1/028 (US);
B29C45/14639 (US);
B29L2031/3418 (EP);
B29L2031/3425 (US);
B29L2031/3481 (EP);
H04R2201/02 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/26] | B29C45/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | HARZGEHÄUSE MIT ELEKTRONISCHER KOMPONENTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2023/26] | English: | ELECTRONIC COMPONENT-EQUIPPED RESIN CASING AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2023/26] | French: | BOÎTIER DE RÉSINE ÉQUIPÉ D'UN COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2023 | Translation filed | 24.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2000164803 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,6-8 * Claim 1, 6; para. [0016, 0019, 0031-0034]; fig. 1, 2, 5, 5 * [I] 9; | [XI]US2010208920 (LEE DUK WOO [KR], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * Claim 8, 13, 15; para. [0036, 0064, 0111]; fig. 1-3, 6, 7 *[I] 2-4,10-12 | International search | [AX]JP2000164803 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 5-11 [X] 1-4; | [AX]EP1158375 (ASULAB SA [CH]) [A] 5-11 [X] 1-4; | [A]JP2006196865 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO) [A] 1-11 * entire text, all drawings *; | [AX]JP2012134272 (NEC CORP) [A] 5-11 [X] 1-4; | [A]CN207764571U (CHUMEN WENWEN INFORMATION TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-11* entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2018524799 (TACTOTEK OY) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0028]-[0059], fig. 1-5 * |