EP4261584 - OPTICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 30, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07796 / KR | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIN, Doo Shik Seoul 07796 / KR | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21903881.7 | 09.12.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021KR18688 | Priority number, date | KR20200171667 | 09.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200171667 | [2023/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022124836 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4261584 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B13/00, G02B9/64, G02B3/00 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
G02B9/64 (EP,KR,US);
G02B13/0045 (EP,KR,US);
G02B13/0055 (KR);
G02B27/646 (EP);
G02B3/0087 (KR);
G02B5/20 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES SYSTEM | [2023/42] | English: | OPTICAL SYSTEM | [2023/42] | French: | SYSTÈME OPTIQUE | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2023 | Translation filed | 28.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0990214 (FUJI PHOTO OPTICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2006195064 (KONICA MINOLTA PHOTO IMAGING); | [A]KR20180095276 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2020012078 (KUO TZU-CHIEH [TW]); | [XA]CN111736310 (AAC COMMUNICATION TECH CHANGZHOU CO LTD) |