EP4255576 - METHODS TO SENSITIZE CANCER CELLS TO IMMUNE ATTACK USING ATRACTYLENOLIDE I [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | 09.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Indiana University 107 S. Indiana Avenue Bloomington, IN 47405 / US | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Xiongbin Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Xinna Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | 03 /
VAN DER JEUGHT, Kevin Indianapolis, Indiana 46202 / US | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21904128.2 | 30.11.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021US61295 | Priority number, date | US202063122232P | 07.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063122232 P | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022125339 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4255576 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/00, A61K39/00, A61K35/17 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (EP);
A61K39/39558 (EP);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4632 (EP,US);
A61K39/4644 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/2818 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/365, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SENSIBILISIERUNG VON KREBSZELLEN GEGENÜBER EINEM IMMUNANGRIFF UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ATRACTYLENOLID I | [2023/41] | English: | METHODS TO SENSITIZE CANCER CELLS TO IMMUNE ATTACK USING ATRACTYLENOLIDE I | [2023/41] | French: | MÉTHODES POUR SENSIBILISER DES CELLULES CANCÉREUSES À UNE ATTAQUE IMMUNITAIRE À L'AIDE D'ATRACTYLÉNOLIDE I | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9734472 (UNIV YALE [US], et al); | [A]US2017202937 (WEINSCHENK TONI [DE], et al); | [XYA]CN108478557 (UNIV ZHEJIANG CHINESE MEDICAL); | [Y]US2019321370 (SORRENTINO JESSICA A [US], et al); |