EP4265130 - FILTER CAPSULE FOR FLAVOR INHALATION ARTICLE, FILTER FOR FLAVOR INHALATION ARTICLE, HEATING-TYPE FLAVOR INHALATION ARTICLE, COMBUSTIBLE-TYPE FLAVOR INHALATION ARTICLE, AND NON-COMBUSTIBLE, NON-HEATING-TYPE FLAVOR INHALATION ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6927 / JP | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKURAI, Toru Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21906467.2 | 08.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021JP45181 | Priority number, date | JP20200208959 | 17.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020208959 | [2023/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022131104 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265130 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/04, A24D3/17 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
A24D3/048 (EP);
A24D3/061 (EP);
A24D3/16 (EP);
B01J13/04 (EP);
B01J13/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERKAPSEL FÜR AROMAINHALATIONSARTIKEL, FILTER FÜR AROMAINHALATIONSARTIKEL, AROMAINHALATIONSARTIKEL UND NICHTBRENNBARER, NICHTHEIZENDER AROMAINHALATIONSARTIKEL | [2023/43] | English: | FILTER CAPSULE FOR FLAVOR INHALATION ARTICLE, FILTER FOR FLAVOR INHALATION ARTICLE, HEATING-TYPE FLAVOR INHALATION ARTICLE, COMBUSTIBLE-TYPE FLAVOR INHALATION ARTICLE, AND NON-COMBUSTIBLE, NON-HEATING-TYPE FLAVOR INHALATION ARTICLE | [2023/43] | French: | CAPSULE DE FILTRE POUR ARTICLE D'INHALATION D'ARÔME, FILTRE POUR ARTICLE D'INHALATION D'ARÔME, ARTICLE D'INHALATION D'ARÔME DE TYPE À CHAUFFAGE, ARTICLE D'INHALATION D'ARÔME DE TYPE À COMBUSTION, ET ARTICLE D'INHALATION D'ARÔME DE TYPE SANS CHAUFFAGE ET SANS COMBUSTION | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2023 | Translation filed | 20.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 16.01.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS62198378 (TAKATSU KAZUO, et al) [A] 1-14 * p. 2. upper left column, lines 1-7, fig. 1 *; | [A]JP2001178376 (SANKYO CO) [A] 1-14 * claim 1, fig. 1 *; | [A]JP2004351007 (SANKYO CO) [A] 1-14* claim 1, fig. 1 *; | [A]WO2014156839 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [A] 1-14 * fig. 1A-1B *; | [A]JP2019527539 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS S.A) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0067]-[0069], fig. 1-2 * | by applicant | WO2014171433 | WO2019130500 |