EP4266801 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING SL COMMUNICATION ON BASIS OF SL DRX CONFIGURATIONS IN NR V2X [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Seungmin Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
HONG, Jongwoo Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
BACK, Seoyoung Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Giwon Seoul 06772 / KR | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/43] | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21907186.7 | 20.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021KR19402 | Priority number, date | KR20200178767 | 18.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200178767 | [2023/43] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022131882 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4266801 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04W72/04, H04W76/28, H04W4/40, H04W92/18 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP,KR);
H04W76/28 (EP,KR,US);
H04W24/08 (KR);
H04W4/40 (EP,KR);
H04W72/0446 (KR);
H04W72/25 (EP,KR);
H04W72/40 (EP);
H04W76/14 (KR);
H04W92/18 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON SL-KOMMUNIKATION AUF BASIS VON SL-DRX-KONFIGURATIONEN IN NR V2X | [2023/43] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING SL COMMUNICATION ON BASIS OF SL DRX CONFIGURATIONS IN NR V2X | [2023/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE RÉALISER UNE COMMUNICATION SL SUR LA BASE DE CONFIGURATIONS DRX SL DANS V2X NR | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2023 | Translation filed | 06.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20200093517 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1,14-20 * See paragraphs [0102]-[0113]; and claims 1 and 5-8. *; | [Y]WO2020198594 (CONVIDA WIRELESS LLC [US]) [Y] 1,14-20 * See paragraphs [0149]-[0228]; and claim 1. *; | [A] - LG Electronics Inc., "Discussion on Sidelink DRX", 3GPP Draft; R2-2008943, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20201023), vol. RAN WG2, no. electronic; 20201102 - 20201113, XP051941993 [A] 2-13 | [A] - Ericsson, "DRX for sidelink communications", 3GPP Draft; R2-2009231, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20201022), vol. RAN WG2, no. e-Meeting; 20201102 - 20201113, XP051941278 [A] 1-20 * See sections 2.2 and 5. * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on architecture enhancements for 3GPP support of advanced Vehicle-to-Everything (V2X) services; Phase 2 (Release 17)", 3GPP Standard; Technical Report; 3GPP TR 23.776, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20201130), no. V1.0.0, pages 1 - 29, XP051961755 [A] 1-20 * See sections 6.2-6.5.1. * |