EP4263681 - OPTICAL FILMS BASED ON STYRENIC FLUOROPOLYMER AND ACRYLIC COPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akron Polymer Systems, Inc. 62 North Summit Street Akron, OH 44308 / US | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Peiyao Hudson, Ohio 44236 / US | 02 /
HARRIS, Frank Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US | 03 /
KUO, Thauming Kingsport, Tennessee 37664 / US | 04 /
LI, Wentao Kingsport, Tennessee 37664 / US | 05 /
PHILLIPS, Alan Johnson City, Tennessee 37615 / US | 06 /
WANG, Bin Kingsport, Tennessee 37660 / US | 07 /
ZHANG, Dong Hudson, Ohio 44236 / US | 08 /
ZHENG, Xiaoliang Hudson, Ohio 44236 / US | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Riechelmann & Carlsohn Patentanwälte PartG mbB Wiener Straße 91 01219 Dresden / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21907622.1 | 14.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021US63289 | Priority number, date | US202063126465P | 16.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063126465 P | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022132755 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4263681 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08L33/12, C08L25/08, C08F112/14, C08F220/14, B29C48/08, B29C55/02 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
C08F112/20 (EP,KR);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
G02B1/04 (US);
B29C48/0018 (EP,KR);
B29C48/022 (EP,KR);
B29C48/08 (EP,KR);
B29C55/04 (EP,KR);
B29C55/12 (EP,KR);
C08F220/14 (EP,KR);
C08L25/18 (EP,KR);
C08L33/12 (EP,KR);
G02B5/3083 (EP,KR);
G02F1/13363 (EP,KR);
H10K50/10 (KR);
H10K59/10 (KR);
H10K59/122 (KR);
B29K2033/12 (EP,KR);
B29L2007/00 (EP,KR);
B29L2011/00 (EP,KR);
C08J2333/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2425/18 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/14, C08F220/1806 (EP);
C08L33/12, C08L25/18 (EP);
C08F220/14, C08F220/14 (EP);
C08F220/14, C08F220/1802 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE FOLIEN AUF BASIS VON STYROLFLUORPOLYMER UND ACRYLCOPOLYMER | [2023/43] | English: | OPTICAL FILMS BASED ON STYRENIC FLUOROPOLYMER AND ACRYLIC COPOLYMER | [2023/43] | French: | FILMS OPTIQUES À BASE DE FLUOROPOLYMÈRE STYRÉNIQUE ET DE COPOLYMÈRE ACRYLIQUE | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 23.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005046074 (TASAKA KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US2008309860 (NIMURA SHIGEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * See the whole document. *; | [X]US2014350166 (ZHENG XIAOLIANG [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * See paragraph [0030]; and claims 1, 7. *; | [A]US2016160036 (KIM JUNG HYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-5* See the whole document. *; | [X]WO2016118873 (AKRON POLYMER SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * See paragraphs [0020], [0038]; claims 1, 4, 6, 21; and table 13. * |