EP4262804 - ENGINEERED URIDINE PHOSPHORYLASE VARIANT ENZYMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Codexis, Inc. 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VROOM, Jonathan Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 02 /
HURTAK, Jessica, Anna Redwood City, California 94063 / US | 03 /
KNIGHT, Anders, Matthew Redwood City, California 94063 / US | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21907939.9 | 17.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021US64161 | Priority number, date | US202063127431P | 18.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063127431 P | US202163148324P | 11.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163148324 P | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022133289 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4262804 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/513, A61K31/70, C07H19/06, C12P19/38 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
C12N9/1077 (EP,IL,US);
C12P19/385 (EP,IL);
C12Y204/02003 (EP,IL,US);
C12R2001/19 (EP,IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | MANIPULIERTE ENZYME MIT URIDINPHOSPHORYLASE-VARIANTE | [2023/43] | English: | ENGINEERED URIDINE PHOSPHORYLASE VARIANT ENZYMES | [2023/43] | French: | ENZYMES VARIANTES D'URIDINE PHOSPHORYLASE MODIFIÉES | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 19.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0160985 (UNIV YALE [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 9, 13-15, 21, 22 * entire document *; | [A]WO2010055369 (CSIR [ZA], et al) [A] 1-3, 9, 13-15, 21, 22 * entire document *; | [A]US2020010823 (NOVICK SCOTT J [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 9, 13-15, 21, 22* entire document * |