EP4269615 - BIOCHIP FOR SPATIAL TRANSCRIPTOMIC ANALYSIS, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligent Healthcare Technology Limited 9/F., MW Tower, No.111 Bonham Strand, Sheung Wan Hong Kong / HK | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Haifeng Hong Kong / HK | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21909593.2 | 25.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021CN141391 | Priority number, date | CN202011568787 | 25.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011568787 | [2023/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022135598 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4269615 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6869 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6834 (EP);
C12N15/1065 (US);
B01J19/0046 (EP);
B01J2219/00549 (EP);
B01J2219/00608 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6834, C12Q2563/179, C12Q2565/514, C12Q2565/629 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | BIOCHIP ZUR RÄUMLICHEN TRANSKRIPTOMANALYSE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/44] | English: | BIOCHIP FOR SPATIAL TRANSCRIPTOMIC ANALYSIS, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2023/44] | French: | BIOPUCE POUR L'ANALYSE TRANSCRIPTOMIQUE À LOCALISATION SPATIALE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET SON APPLICATION | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2023 | Translation filed | 21.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |