EP4264260 - METHODS FOR DIAGNOSING CANCER BASED ON VOLATILE ORGANIC COMPOUNDS IN BLOOD AND URINE SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNION RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION LIMITED Senate House Technion City 3200004 Haifa / IL | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAICK, Hossam 3200004 Haifa / IL | 02 /
EINOCH AMOR, Reef 3200004 Haifa / IL | 03 /
BROZA, Yoav 3200004 Haifa / IL | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bajuwarenring 14 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/43] | Straus, Alexander 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte - München Keltenring 9 82041 Oberhaching / DE | Application number, filing date | 21909711.0 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021IL51515 | Priority number, date | US202063128188P | 21.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063128188 P | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022137232 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4264260 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/497, A61B5/00, G01N27/414, G01N30/88, A61B5/145, G01N33/00, G01N30/02, G01N30/72 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
G01N33/493 (EP);
G01N27/3275 (US);
G01N1/2226 (US);
G01N33/492 (EP);
G01N33/57484 (EP);
G16H10/40 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP);
G16H40/67 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G16H50/70 (EP,US);
G01N2001/2229 (US);
G16H20/10 (EP);
G16H70/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE VON KREBS AUF BASIS FLÜCHTIGER ORGANISCHER VERBINDUNGEN IN BLUT- UND URINPROBEN | [2023/43] | English: | METHODS FOR DIAGNOSING CANCER BASED ON VOLATILE ORGANIC COMPOUNDS IN BLOOD AND URINE SAMPLES | [2023/43] | French: | MÉTHODES DE DIAGNOSTIC DU CANCER BASÉES SUR DES COMPOSÉS ORGANIQUES VOLATILS DANS DES ÉCHANTILLONS DE SANG ET D'URINE | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2018173060 (TECHNION RES & DEV FOUNDATION [IL]) [Y] 6-8 * p. 10. lns. 21-24, 26-29 *; | [YA]US2019271685 (HAICK HOSSAM [IL], et al) [Y] 1,3-18 * paras. 52; 60-61,128-129 claims 1, 3, 22, 24; table 14 * * the whole document * [A] 2,19-43; | [A]US2020337594 (REDDY RAJ [CA]) [A] 6 * the whole document *; | [AY]US2020378973 (HANNA GEORGE [GB], et al) [A] 2,19-43 * the whole document * * title, abstract, paras. 65-66 * [Y] 1,3-18; | [A] - Mohamed Ehab I., Mohamed Marwa A., Abdel-Mageed Samir M., Abdel-Mohdy Taher S., Badawi Mohamed I., Darwish Samy H., "Volatile organic compounds of biofluids for detecting lung cancer by an electronic nose based on artificial neural network", Journal of Applied Biomedicine, (20190319), vol. 17, no. 1, doi:10.32725/jab.2018.006, ISSN 1214-021X, pages 67 - 67, XP055946737 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.32725/jab.2018.006 | [A] - Roine Antti; Veskimäe Erik; Tuokko Antti; Kumpulainen Pekka; Koskimäki Juha; Keinänen Tuomo A.; Häkkinen Merja R.; Vepsäläinen Jouko; Paavonen Timo; Lekkala Jukka; Lehtimäki Terho; Tammela Teuvo L.; Oksala Niku K.J. , "Detection of Prostate Cancer by an Electronic Nose: A Proof of Principle Study", Journal of Urology, Lippincott Williams & Wilkins, BALTIMORE, MD, US, BALTIMORE, MD, US , (20140225), vol. 192, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.juro.2014.01.113, ISSN 0022-5347, pages 230 - 235, XP029005776 [A] 11 * M & M sect. * * the whole document * [A] 1-43 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.juro.2014.01.113 | [A] - Laura Capelli, Gianluigi Taverna, Alessia Bellini, Lidia Eusebio, Niccolò Buffi, Massimo Lazzeri, Giorgio Guazzoni, Giorgio Bozzini, Mauro Seveso, Alberto Mandressi, Lorenzo Tidu, Fabio Grizzi, Paolo Sardella, Giuseppe Latorre, Rodolfo Hurle, Giovanni Lughezzani, Paolo Casale, Sara Meregali, Selena Sironi, "Application and Uses of Electronic Noses for Clinical Diagnosis on Urine Samples: A Review", Sensors, vol. 16, no. 10, doi:10.3390/s16101708, page 1708, XP055337222 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s16101708 |