EP4174909 - LIGHT EMITTING SEAL, AND LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | For all designated states Energetiq Technology, Inc. 205 Lowell Street Wilmington, MA 01887 / US | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Akio Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
FUJITA, Toru Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 03 /
ASAI, Akinori Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 04 /
NAGATA, Yusei Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 05 /
OHBA, Shinichi Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 06 /
OHSHIRO, Takayuki Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 07 /
PARTLOW, Matthew Port Townsend, WA 98368 / US | 08 /
COLLINS, Ron Londonderry, NH 03053 / US | 09 /
HORNE, Stephen F. Medford, MA 02155 / US | 10 /
OWENS, Laura Gloucester, MA 02476 / US | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21909848.0 | 27.09.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021JP35390 | Priority number, date | US202017129750 | 21.12.2020 Original published format: US202017129750 | [2023/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022137690 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174909 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01J65/04, // H01S3/03, H01S3/034, H01S3/038, H01S3/097, H01S3/0971, H01S3/225 | [2024/29] | CPC: |
H01S3/09702 (EP,KR);
H01S3/034 (EP,KR);
H01J65/04 (EP);
H01S3/0305 (EP,KR);
H01S3/038 (EP);
H01S3/0385 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | H01J65/04, H05H1/24, H01J61/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE DICHTUNG UND LICHTQUELLENVORRICHTUNG | [2023/18] | English: | LIGHT EMITTING SEAL, AND LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE | [2023/18] | French: | ENCEINTE ÉMETTANT DE LA LUMIÈRE ET DISPOSITIF SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2023 | Translation filed | 26.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2009070586 (IMAGINEERING KK); | [A]JP2010205651 (TOKYO INST TECH, et al); | [A]US2011205529 (GROSS KENNETH P [US], et al); | [A]JP2016201178 (USHIO ELECTRIC INC); | [A]JP2017037802 (IHI CORP); | [A]JP2017524271 | by applicant | US9814126 |