EP4269734 - INSIDE HANDLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpha Corporation 6-8, Fukuura 1-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIZUKA, Mitsuo Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21910449.4 | 13.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021JP45909 | Priority number, date | JP20200213846 | 23.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020213846 | [2023/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022138300 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4269734 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E05B85/12, B60J5/04, E05B79/08 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
E05B79/06 (EP);
E05B85/13 (US);
E05B85/12 (EP);
E05C21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | INNENGRIFFVORRICHTUNG | [2023/44] | English: | INSIDE HANDLE DEVICE | [2023/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POIGNÉE INTÉRIEURE | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2023 | Translation filed | 05.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH08291651 (AISIN SEIKI) [A] 1-8 * fig. 3, 5 *; | [A]JPH09235917 (NARUMI GOKIN SEISAKUSHO KK, et al) [A] 1-8 * fig. 6 *; | [A]US2005134058 (BELCHINE WALTER III [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * fig. 4 *; | [A]JP2005307533 (SHIROKI CORP) [A] 1-8 * fig. 2 *; | [A]JP2013536341 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC) [A] 1-8 * fig. 5, 12 *; | [A]JP2014034801 (SAKAE RIKEN KOGYO CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-8 * fig. 7, 9 *; | [A]JP2018197428 (ALPHA CORP) [A] 7* abstract, fig. 1-7 * | by applicant | JP2020213846 | JP2013536341 | US2014239652 |