EP4270535 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SHEET FOR SOLID SECONDARY BATTERY, AND BINDING AGENT FOR SOLID SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South 1-13-1, Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Takaya Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Masahiko Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 03 /
HIRAGA, Kentarou Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 04 /
SUI, Xianwei Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 05 /
TERADA, Junpei Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 06 /
FUJIWARA, Kae Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 07 /
FUJIOKA, Seika Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 08 /
TOKUHIRA, Katsusada Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 09 /
USAMI, Ryouta Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21911079.8 | 24.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021JP48327 | Priority number, date | JP20200217248 | 25.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020217248 | [2023/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022138942 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4270535 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/139, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M10/0562 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/139 (EP,KR);
H01M4/623 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/0562 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0587 (US);
H01M4/13 (KR);
H01M4/625 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2004/028 (EP,KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FOLIE FÜR EINE FESTSTOFFSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND BINDEMITTEL FÜR EINE FESTSTOFFSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2023/44] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SHEET FOR SOLID SECONDARY BATTERY, AND BINDING AGENT FOR SOLID SECONDARY BATTERY | [2023/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FILM POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE SOLIDE ET AGENT DE LIAISON POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE SOLIDE | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2023 | Translation filed | 18.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH06316784 (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND); | [YX]JPH09129218 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [YX]JPH113709 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [Y]JP2008140809 (NIPPON ZEON CO); | [Y]JP2011150954 (PANASONIC CORP); | [Y]JP2018067506 (UNIV MIE); | [YX]WO2020127223 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) | by applicant | JPH06316784 | JP2008140809 | WO2012063622 | WO2012086710 | WO2015080291 | JP2020115485 | WO2020170797 |