EP4270752 - ACTIVE CURRENT COMPENSATION APPARATUS CAPABLE OF DETECTING MALFUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EM Coretech Co., Ltd. 106-dong 504-1-ho, 50, Unist-gil Eonyang-eup Ulsan 44919 / KR | For all designated states UNIST (Ulsan National Institute of Science and Technology) 50, UNIST-gil Eonyang-eup Ulju-gun, Ulsan 44919 / KR | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jin Gook Ulsan 44919 / KR | 02 /
JEONG, Sang Yeong Ulsan 44919 / KR | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21911153.1 | 11.06.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021KR07359 | Priority number, date | KR20200182641 | 23.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200182641 | KR20200182642 | 23.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200182642 | KR20200183864 | 24.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200183864 | KR20210024761 | 24.02.2021 Original published format: KR 20210024761 | [2023/44] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022139083 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4270752 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/44, H02M1/12, G01R31/28, H03F3/45, // H02M1/32, H02M1/36 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
H03F3/45475 (EP);
H01F27/427 (US);
G01R19/10 (EP);
G01R19/165 (EP);
G01R19/16576 (US);
G01R31/2827 (EP);
H01F27/42 (EP);
H01L27/07 (EP);
H02M1/00 (EP);
H02M1/123 (EP);
H02M1/44 (EP,US);
H02M3/156 (EP);
H03F1/22 (EP);
H03F1/305 (US);
H01F2017/0093 (US);
H01F2017/065 (US);
H02M1/32 (EP);
H02M1/36 (EP);
H03F2203/45138 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/44] | H02M1/44, H02M3/156, H02M1/00, H01L27/07, H03F1/22, H01F27/42, G01R19/165, G01R19/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | AKTIVE STROMKOMPENSATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT FÄHIGKEIT ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER FEHLFUNKTION | [2023/44] | English: | ACTIVE CURRENT COMPENSATION APPARATUS CAPABLE OF DETECTING MALFUNCTION | [2023/44] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMPENSATION ACTIVE DE COURANT PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER UN DYSFONCTIONNEMENT | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2023 | Translation filed | 07.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2020213997 (EM CORETECH [KR], et al); | International search | [A]KR100200117B (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-6* See paragraphs [0009]-[0022]; and figure 2. *; | [Y]JP2002010650 (INT RECTIFIER CORP) [Y] 1-6 * See paragraphs [0034]-[0037] and [0111]-[0120]; and figures 7-8 and 26. *; | [Y]KR20160117703 (MAGNACHIP SEMICONDUCTOR LTD [KR]) [Y] 6 * See paragraph [0038]; and figure 2. *; | [A]KR20190105849 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-6 * See paragraphs [0039]-[0051]; and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR20200122264 (ULSAN NAT INST SCIENCE & TECH UNIST [KR], et al) [Y] 1-6 * See paragraphs [0036], [0039], [0045], [0051] and [0061]-[0062]; claim 1; and figures 1 and 5b. * |