EP4267578 - ESTROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Recurium IP Holdings, LLC 10275 Science Center Drive, Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Guobao San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Peter, Qinhua San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
BUNKER, Kevin, Duane San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
HEGDE, Sayee, Gajanan San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21912267.8 | 17.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021US72983 | Priority number, date | US202063130123P | 23.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063130123 P | US202163164095P | 22.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163164095 P | US202163265052P | 07.12.2021 Original published format: US 202163265052 P | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022140744 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4267578 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61P35/00 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,AU,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,AU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | ÖSTROGENREZEPTORMODULATOREN | [2023/44] | English: | ESTROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATORS | [2023/44] | French: | MODULATEURS DU RÉCEPTEUR DES ÉSTROGÈNES | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 30.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2016097072 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al); | [Y]WO2017172957 (KALYRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]); | [Y]WO2019245974 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); |