EP4249310 - VEHICLE BRAKING CONTROL METHOD AND DEVICE, AND VEHICLE BRAKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOU, Maosheng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WEN, Jingbin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Shenglin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Li Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 21913694.2 | 30.11.2021 | [2023/39] | WO2021CN134236 | Priority number, date | CN202011577626 | 28.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011577626 | [2023/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022142953 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4249310 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60L7/10, B60L3/00, B60T8/17, B60T8/32 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
B60L7/18 (EP,CN);
B60L7/10 (CN);
B60L15/2009 (EP,CN);
B60L3/0076 (EP);
B60L7/26 (EP);
B60T1/10 (EP);
B60T8/00 (EP);
B60T8/321 (EP);
B60W10/08 (EP);
B60W10/184 (EP);
B60W30/18109 (CN);
B60W30/18127 (EP,CN);
B60L2200/40 (EP);
B60L2240/12 (EP);
B60L2240/36 (EP);
B60L2240/425 (EP);
B60T2250/04 (EP);
B60T2270/604 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/39] | B60L7/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FAHRZEUGBREMSSTEUERUNG UND FAHRZEUGBREMSSYSTEM | [2023/39] | English: | VEHICLE BRAKING CONTROL METHOD AND DEVICE, AND VEHICLE BRAKING SYSTEM | [2023/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE FREINAGE DE VÉHICULE ET SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE DE VÉHICULE | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2023 | Translation filed | 23.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]CN103192721 (UNIV QINGDAO TECHNOLOGICAL); | [YA]US2019071062 (ROBERE MATTHEW A [US], et al); | [XYI]US2020079219 (OKUBO SHUNSUKE [US], et al) |