EP4273137 - SERIES OF PIPERIDINE-SUBSTITUTED BENZOIC ACID COMPOUNDS, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medshine Discovery Inc. Room 218, No. 9 Gaoxin Road Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210032 / CN | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Kevin X Shanghai 200131 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Li Shanghai 200131 / CN | 03 /
GUI, Houze Shanghai 200131 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Haoyu Shanghai 200131 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Huiyu Shanghai 200131 / CN | 06 /
HU, Guoping Shanghai 200131 / CN | 07 /
LI, Jian Shanghai 200131 / CN | 08 /
CHEN, Shuhui Shanghai 200131 / CN | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 21914669.3 | 30.12.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021CN143257 | Priority number, date | CN202011610857 | 30.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011610857 | CN202110266011 | 11.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110266011 | CN202110751316 | 02.07.2021 Original published format: CN202110751316 | CN202111234085 | 22.10.2021 Original published format: CN202111234085 | [2023/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022143940 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4273137 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D401/02, C07D403/02, C07D403/06, A61K31/454, A61P13/12 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | REIHE PIPERIDIN-SUBSTITUIERTER BENZOESÄUREVERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2023/45] | English: | SERIES OF PIPERIDINE-SUBSTITUTED BENZOIC ACID COMPOUNDS, AND USE THEREOF | [2023/45] | French: | SÉRIE DE COMPOSÉS D'ACIDE BENZOÏQUE SUBSTITUÉS PAR PIPÉRIDINE ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2023 | Translation filed | 26.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 16.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |