EP4243487 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING PACKET IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHA, Jiyoung Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Byounghoon Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Jungsoo Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Hyunjoong Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21915836.7 | 29.12.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021KR20199 | Priority number, date | KR20200186774 | 29.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200186774 | [2023/37] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022146039 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4243487 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/1607, H04L1/1829, H04L1/1867, H04W80/02 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
H04L1/1621 (EP);
H04W28/04 (KR);
H04L1/1825 (US);
H04L1/1628 (EP,KR);
H04L1/1635 (EP);
H04L1/1832 (EP);
H04L1/1835 (EP);
H04L1/1858 (KR);
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04L69/321 (KR);
H04L69/322 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/45] | H04L1/00, H04L1/16, H04L1/18, H04L1/1607, H04L1/1829, H04L1/1867, H04W28/04, H04W28/06 | ||
Former IPC [2023/37] | H04W28/04, H04W28/06, H04L1/16, H04L1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PAKETVERARBEITUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2023/37] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING PACKET IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2023/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE PAQUET DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2023 | Translation filed | 09.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 12.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2011317719 (VEDANTHAM RAMANUJA [US], et al) [X] 1,6,12,15 * figures 4, 5, 9 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] * [A] 4,5,7,8,11 [Y] 2,3,9,10,13,14; | [Y]KR20180111413 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2,3,9,10,13,14 * figures 1Qa, 1Qb ** paragraph [0302] - paragraph [0308] * | International search | [A]KR100896507B (ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE et al.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0029]; and figure 2. *; | [A]US2009185477 (LEE YOUNG DAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0084]-[0108]; and figures 6-9. *; | [A]KR100996069B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0021] and [0056]-[0080]; and figures 4-9. *; | [A]US2015264675 (KIM SOENG-HUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0168]-[0191]; and figures 17-20. *; | [A]KR20180119891 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0735]-[0782]; and figures 5a-5h. * |