EP4271946 - AIR PURIFICATION AND SURFACE STERILIZATION SYSTEMS INTEGRATABLE INTO BUILDING STRUCTURES AND FURNITURE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Armstrong World Industries, Inc. 2500 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 3001 Lancaster, PA 17604-3001 / US | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANTZ, William H. Elizabethtown, PA 17022 / US | 02 /
WIKER, Anthony L. Lancaster, PA 17601 / US | 03 /
WALTEMYER, Alexandra G. York, PA 17402 / US | 04 /
BAXTER, Meredith G. Lancaster, PA 17603 / US | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/45] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 21916213.8 | 16.12.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021US63921 | Priority number, date | US202063132815P | 31.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063132815 P | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022146716 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4271946 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24F8/22, A61L9/20, A61L2/10, F24F13/20 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
A61L9/20 (EP,US);
A61L2/10 (EP);
F24F7/06 (EP);
F24F8/22 (EP);
G10K11/162 (EP,US);
A61L2202/11 (EP);
A61L2202/25 (EP);
A61L2209/12 (US);
A61L2209/14 (EP,US);
A61L2209/15 (US);
A61L2209/16 (EP,US);
F24F2221/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | IN GEBÄUDESTRUKTUREN INTEGRIERBARE LUFTREINIGUNGS- UND OBERFLÄCHENSTERILISATIONSSYSTEME UND MÖBELSYSTEME | [2023/45] | English: | AIR PURIFICATION AND SURFACE STERILIZATION SYSTEMS INTEGRATABLE INTO BUILDING STRUCTURES AND FURNITURE SYSTEMS | [2023/45] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE PURIFICATION D'AIR ET DE STÉRILISATION DE SURFACE POUVANT ÊTRE INTÉGRÉS DANS DES STRUCTURES DE BÂTIMENTS ET DES SYSTÈMES DE MOBILIER | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 16.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2007507259 ; | [Y]US2008196860 (PETLACH JIRI [CZ]); | [Y]KR20100105985 (JP LIGHTING INC [KR]); | [XY]KR101425366B (TRECO CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]JP2014199176 (ISHIBASHI AKIRA, et al); | [Y]US2018002926 (BERGMAN TODD M [US]) |