EP4271978 - MICROSCOPE WITH SPATIAL IMAGING AND BEAM HOMOGENIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Q-State Biosciences, Inc. 179 Sidney Street Cambridge, MA 02139-4238 / US | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WERLEY, Christopher Cambridge, MA 02139-4238 / US | 02 /
LU, Yang Somerville, MA 02144 / US | 03 /
MOHAN, Arvind Cambridge, MA 02139-4238 / US | 04 /
LIU, Pin Cambridge, MA 02139-4238 / US | 05 /
DEMPSEY, Graham T. Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | 06 /
BREMMER, Nate Cambridge, MA 02139-4238 / US | 07 /
AMAR, William Cambridge, MA 02139-4228 / US | 08 /
ZHANG, Hongkang Wellesley, MA 02482 / US | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 21916354.0 | 28.12.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021US65319 | Priority number, date | US202063132889P | 31.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063132889 P | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022146990 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4271978 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/01, G02B21/06, G01N21/64, G02B21/00, G02B21/34 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
G01N21/6452 (EP);
G02B21/26 (US);
G01N21/0303 (US);
G01N21/6458 (EP,US);
G01N21/648 (EP);
G02B21/06 (US);
G02B21/088 (EP);
G02B21/16 (EP,US);
G02B21/365 (EP,US);
G02B26/0833 (EP,US);
G02B27/1006 (US);
G02B27/141 (US);
G01N2021/6463 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6482 (US);
G01N2201/0446 (US);
G01N2201/0631 (EP,US);
G01N2201/103 (US);
G01N2201/104 (US);
G01N2201/1087 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | MIKROSKOP MIT RÄUMLICHER BILDGEBUNG UND STRAHLHOMOGENISIERER | [2023/45] | English: | MICROSCOPE WITH SPATIAL IMAGING AND BEAM HOMOGENIZER | [2023/45] | French: | MICROSCOPE À IMAGERIE SPATIALE ET HOMOGÉNÉISATEUR DE FAISCEAU | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 08.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0050872 (CELLOMICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-10, 12-15 * entire document *; | [Y]US7978412 (MORIWAKA TOMOAKI [JP]) [Y] 8 * entire document *; | [Y]US8908277 (PESACH BENNY [IL], et al) [Y] 9 * entire document *; | [Y]US2017315430 (WANG CHI-HSUN [TW], et al) [Y] 7 * entire document *; | [A]US2017370827 (WOHLSTADTER JACOB N [US], et al) [A] 1-15* entire document *; | [Y]US2018136446 (WERLEY CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [Y] 1-10, 12-15 * entire document *; | [Y]US2020158497 (ARNOULT ALEXANDRE [FR], et al) [Y] 10 * entire document * |