EP4275232 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR LED STRUCTURES THAT INCREASE CURRENT FLOW DENSITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jade Bird Display (Shanghai) Limited 1889 Hongyin Road, Pudong Shanghai 201306 / CN | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Qiming Albuquerque, New Mexico 87123 / US | 02 /
FANG, Anle Shanghai 201306 / CN | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 21916799.6 | 08.01.2021 | [2023/46] | WO2021CN70780 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022147742 | Date: | 14.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4275232 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/15, H01L33/48 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
H01L33/30 (EP,KR);
H01L33/14 (KR,US);
H01L33/04 (EP,KR);
H01L33/12 (EP,KR);
H01L33/44 (US);
H01L33/62 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR LED-STRUKTUREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER STROMFLUSSDICHTE | [2023/46] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR LED STRUCTURES THAT INCREASE CURRENT FLOW DENSITY | [2023/46] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR STRUCTURES DE DEL QUI AUGMENTENT LA DENSITÉ DE FLUX DE COURANT | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN107394015 (UNIV TAIYUAN TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-48* the whole document *; | [A]CN109037250 (SHANGHAI HARVEST INTELLIGENCE TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-48 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2019012350 (UNIV KING ABDULLAH SCI & TECH [SA]) [A] 1-48 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2019371964 (BOUR DAVID P [US], et al) [Y] 3,8,11,15-16,20-22,25 * description, paragraphs [0127]-[0161], figures 18A-23 *; | [Y]US2019378957 (EL-GHOROURY HUSSEIN S [US], et al) [Y] 3,20-24 * description, paragraphs [0048]-[0052], figures 6 *; | [XY]CN111261658 (TCL CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-2,4-7,17-19 * description, paragraphs [0054]-[0098], figures 6A-7 * [Y] 3,8,11,15-16,20-25 |