EP4277134 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING TRANSMISSION POWER BASED ON BLUETOOTH COMMUNICATION IN ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Insik Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 21919934.6 | 24.12.2021 | [2023/46] | WO2021KR19805 | Priority number, date | KR20210004661 | 13.01.2021 Original published format: KR 20210004661 | [2023/46] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022154310 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4277134 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/401, H04W52/36, H04W52/54, H04W52/38, // H04W52/24, H04W52/26 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
H04W52/367 (EP,US);
H04B1/04 (KR);
H04W52/383 (EP,US);
H04B1/401 (EP,KR);
H04B5/48 (KR);
H04W52/24 (US);
H04W52/245 (EP,KR);
H04W52/36 (KR);
H04W52/54 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/46] | H04B1/04, H04B1/401, H04B5/02, H04W52/24, H04W52/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER ÜBERTRAGUNGSLEISTUNG AUF BASIS VON BLUETOOTH-KOMMUNIKATION IN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2023/46] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING TRANSMISSION POWER BASED ON BLUETOOTH COMMUNICATION IN ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE DE TRANSMISSION SUR LA BASE D'UNE COMMUNICATION BLUETOOTH DANS UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2023 | Translation filed | 10.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016374028 (NARANG MOHIT [US], et al); | [A]US2019393932 (HSU CHIEN-FANG [TW], et al); | International search | [Y]KR100542101B ; | [A]KR100723106B ; | [Y]KR20110081954 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | [A]KR101484623B ; | [A]KR101575993B ; | [Y]US10757654 (WANG YAJUN [CN], et al) |