EP4084176 - LAMINATING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wuxi Lead Intelligent Equipment Co., Ltd. No.20 Xinxi Road National High-tech Industrial Development Zone Wuxi, Jiangsu 214123 / CN | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAO, Junfu Wuxi Jiangsu 214123 / CN | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 21920104.3 | 14.10.2021 | [2022/44] | WO2021CN123899 | Priority number, date | CN202110178705 | 09.02.2021 Original published format: CN202110178705 | [2022/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022170780 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4084176 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.08.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
H01M10/0404 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65H35/04 (KR);
H01M10/04 (EP);
H01M10/0413 (EP);
H01M10/0436 (EP);
H01M10/0459 (EP,US);
H01M10/0583 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0585 (EP);
H01M4/04 (EP);
H01M6/005 (EP,CN);
B32B2457/10 (EP);
B32B37/26 (EP);
B65H2301/51536 (KR);
B65H2701/19 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | KASCHIERMASCHINE | [2022/44] | English: | LAMINATING MACHINE | [2022/44] | French: | MACHINE À PLASTIFIER | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2022 | Translation filed | 25.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 27.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2020180028 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) |