EP4257023 - BIDIRECTIONAL ROTATING CLEANING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Prulde Electric Appliance Co., Ltd. Industry Development Zone of Xiaoshun Town Jindong District Jinhua, Zhejiang 321035 / CN | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Weiming Jinhua, Zhejiang 321035 / CN | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | karo IP karo IP Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels PartG mbB Postfach 32 01 02 40416 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21920661.2 | 20.10.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021CN125051 | Priority number, date | CN202120139770U | 19.01.2021 Original published format: CN 202120139770 U | [2023/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022156283 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4257023 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/16, A47L11/283, A47L11/40, B63B59/06 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
A47L11/4038 (EP,US);
A47L11/4069 (EP,US);
A47L11/16 (EP);
A47L11/282 (US);
A47L11/283 (EP);
B63B59/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | A47L11/283, A47L11/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | BIDIREKTIONALE ROTIERENDE REINIGUNGSSTRUKTUR | [2023/41] | English: | BIDIRECTIONAL ROTATING CLEANING STRUCTURE | [2023/41] | French: | STRUCTURE DE NETTOYAGE ROTATIVE BIDIRECTIONNELLE | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2023 | Translation filed | 06.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE318309 (AKTIEBOLAGET LUX [SE]); | [A]CH374459 (BONFANTI SILVIO [IT]); | [A]US6032313 (TSANG KOON KEUNG [HK]); | [A]KR101404625B (LEE SANG NEUNG [KR], et al) |