EP4270810 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTING ANTENNA, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Rentian Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Fei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Zhilin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21922626.3 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021CN140163 | Priority number, date | CN202110139652 | 30.01.2021 Original published format: CN202110139652 | [2023/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022161036 | Date: | 04.08.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4270810 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.08.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04L5/00 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H04B7/0608 (EP,CN);
H04B7/061 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (CN);
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04L5/0023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSWAHL EINER ANTENNE, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/44] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTING ANTENNA, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SÉLECTION D'ANTENNE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2023 | Translation filed | 27.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]KR20080096336 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]CN102946266 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [I]US10187132 (KURTH MATHIAS [DE], et al) |