EP4269646 - ALUMINUM PLATED STEEL SHEET, THERMOFORMED COMPONENT, AND MANUFACTURING METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL CO., LTD. No.885 Fujin Road Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAN, Ning Shanghai 201900 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Hao Shanghai 201900 / CN | 03 /
JIN, Xinyan Shanghai 201900 / CN | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21922639.6 | 23.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021CN140835 | Priority number, date | CN202110119239 | 28.01.2021 Original published format: CN202110119239 | [2023/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022161049 | Date: | 04.08.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4269646 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/12, C23C26/02, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/14, C22C38/18, C22C38/32, C22C38/48 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
C21D8/0205 (EP);
C23C2/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,CN,KR);
B21C37/02 (CN,KR);
B32B15/012 (EP);
C21D1/18 (EP);
C21D1/26 (CN,KR);
C21D1/673 (EP);
C21D7/13 (EP);
C21D8/005 (US);
C21D8/02 (KR);
C21D8/0226 (EP,CN,KR);
C21D8/0236 (EP,CN,KR);
C21D8/0247 (EP);
C21D8/0263 (CN,KR);
C21D8/0278 (EP);
C21D9/0081 (US);
C21D9/46 (EP);
C22C38/002 (US);
C22C38/04 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C38/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/14 (KR);
C22C38/18 (KR);
C22C38/24 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C38/26 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/32 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/34 (CN,KR,US);
C22C38/38 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C38/48 (KR);
C22C38/60 (CN,KR);
C23C2/02 (EP);
C23C2/022 (EP,KR);
C23C2/026 (KR);
C23C2/28 (EP);
C23C2/29 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/40 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C23C28/02 (EP);
C23C28/021 (EP);
C23C28/023 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | ALUMINIUMPLATTIERTES STAHLBLECH, WARMGEFORMTE KOMPONENTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/44] | English: | ALUMINUM PLATED STEEL SHEET, THERMOFORMED COMPONENT, AND MANUFACTURING METHODS | [2023/44] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER PLAQUÉE D'ALUMINIUM, COMPOSANT THERMOFORMÉ ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2023 | Translation filed | 24.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |