EP4289876 - RESIN COMPOSITION, OPTICAL FIBER, OPTICAL FIBER MANUFACTURING METHOD, OPTICAL FIBER RIBBON, AND OPTICAL FIBER CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOMMA, Yuya Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 21924861.4 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/50] | WO2021JP47301 | Priority number, date | JP20210016587 | 04.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021016587 | [2023/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022168476 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4289876 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.08.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C08F290/06, C08G18/48, C08G18/81, C03C25/24, G02B6/44, C08G18/28, C08G18/71, C08G18/10, C08G18/24, C08G18/67, C08G18/76, C08G18/80, C08L51/08, C08L75/16, C09D175/16, // C03C25/1065, G02B6/02 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
C03C25/1065 (EP,US);
C03C25/105 (US);
C03C25/326 (US);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/246 (EP);
C08G18/283 (EP);
C08G18/4825 (EP);
C08G18/4829 (EP);
C08G18/672 (EP);
C08G18/718 (EP);
C08G18/7621 (EP);
C08G18/809 (EP);
C08G18/8116 (EP);
C08L51/08 (EP);
C08L75/16 (EP);
C09D175/16 (EP);
G02B6/02395 (EP,US);
G02B6/4403 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F290/067, C08F220/286, C08F220/1811, C08F226/02, C08F220/36, C08F230/085 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/672 (EP);
C08G18/672, C08G18/48 (EP);
C09D175/16, C08L75/16, C08L51/08 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/50] | C08F290/06, C08G18/48, C08G18/81, C03C25/24, G02B6/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, GLASFASER, GLASFASERHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, GLASFASERBAND UND GLASFASERKABEL | [2023/50] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION, OPTICAL FIBER, OPTICAL FIBER MANUFACTURING METHOD, OPTICAL FIBER RIBBON, AND OPTICAL FIBER CABLE | [2023/50] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE, FIBRE OPTIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FIBRE OPTIQUE, RUBAN DE FIBRE OPTIQUE ET CÂBLE À FIBRE OPTIQUE | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2023 | Translation filed | 26.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2016088801 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [XYI]US2019225732 (CHEN YANGBIN [US], et al); | [XYI]NL2020470B (CORNING INC [US]) | International search | [A]JP2010235814 (JSR CORP, et al); | [A]JP2013221978 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2014201489 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2015042599 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]WO2016088801 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]CN109929430 (HANGZHOU FIRST APPLIED MAT CO LTD); | [A]CN109929429 (HANGZHOU FIRST APPLIED MAT CO LTD); | [A]US2019225732 (CHEN YANGBIN [US], et al); | [A]WO2019151453 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]WO2019213367 (CORNING INC [US]) | by applicant | JP2009197163 | JP2012111674 | JP2013501125 | JP2013136783 | JP2014114208 | JP2021016587 |