EP4288138 - SYSTEMS, METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ELECTRICAL STIMULATION THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theragen, Inc. 11220 Asset Loop Suite 210 Manassas, VA 20109 / US | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEARCE, Richard, H. Cary, NC 27518 / US | 02 /
MCAULIFFE, Jon, Christopher Jacksonville, FL 32224 / US | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Okoampah, Rene df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 21925070.1 | 21.10.2021 | [2023/50] | WO2021US55955 | Priority number, date | US202163146196P | 05.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163146196 P | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022169491 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4288138 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/00, A61N1/04, A61N1/36 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
A61N1/0464 (EP,US);
A61N1/36031 (EP,US);
A61B5/1118 (EP);
A61B5/4833 (US);
A61N1/0468 (EP,US);
A61N1/0492 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR ELEKTRISCHE STIMULATIONSTHERAPIE | [2023/50] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ELECTRICAL STIMULATION THERAPY | [2023/50] | French: | SYSTÈMES, MÉTHODES ET DISPOSITIFS DE THÉRAPIE PAR STIMULATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2012221073 (SOUTHWELL BRIDGET RAE [AU], et al) [Y] 10, 11, 15-60 * entire document, especially: fig 1; para: [0044], [0060], [0101], [0103] *; | [A]US2013289652 (SKELTON DENNIS M [US], et al) [A] 1-60 * entire document *; | [A]US2016235981 (SOUTHWELL BRIDGET RAE [AU], et al) [A] 1-60 * entire document *; | [XY]US2016339259 (DAVIS JON P [US], et al) [X] 1-9, 12-14 * entire document, especially: fig 2, fig 3; para: [0063], [0065], [0075], [0080], [0093], [0097], [0107], [0115], [0118], [0119], [0129]-[0133], ]0137], [0140], [0141], [0143], [0151]-[0154], [0169], [0202], [[0235], 0289] * [Y] 10, 11, 15-60; | [A]US2020297999 (PAL SUMON K [US]) [A] 1-60* entire document * |