EP4292501 - AUTOMATIC CLEANING DEVICE CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS, MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Roborock Innovation Technology Co., Ltd. Room 1201, Floor 12, Building 3, Yard 17 Anju Road Changping District Beijing 102206 / CN | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Lei Beijing 102206 / CN | 02 /
GUAN, Xin Beijing 102206 / CN | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 21925367.1 | 09.06.2021 | [2023/51] | WO2021CN99221 | Priority number, date | CN202110184743 | 10.02.2021 Original published format: CN202110184743 | [2023/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022170713 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4292501 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/40, G05D1/02 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
G05D1/0214 (EP);
A47L11/4011 (EP,CN,US);
A47L11/24 (CN);
A47L11/4008 (US);
A47L11/4061 (CN,US);
A47L2201/00 (CN);
A47L2201/04 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER AUTOMATISCHEN REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, MEDIUM UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/51] | English: | AUTOMATIC CLEANING DEVICE CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS, MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE AUTOMATIQUE, SUPPORT, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2023 | Translation filed | 08.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03062936 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN107773164 (BEIJING QIHOO TECHNOLOGY CO) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]US2018232134 (EBRAHIMI AFROUZI ALI [US], et al) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [A]CN110353579 (CHENGDU PROSPER ROBOTICS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN110393482 (SHENZHEN FEIKE ROBOT CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [X]CN110709790 (ROBART GMBH) [X] 1-3, 7-10 * description paragraphs [0028]-[0046], [0081]-[0087], [0114]-[0116], figures 1, 5, 7 *; | [A]CN111248819 (SHENZHEN CITY SILVER STAR INTELLIGENT POLYTRON TECH INC) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN111381590 (ZHUHAI AMICRO SEMICONDUCTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN111722630 (SHENZHEN CITY SILVER STAR INTELLIGENT POLYTRON TECH INC) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN111904346 (SHENZHEN TOPBAND CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN112006611 (SHARKNINJA CHINA TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document * |