EP4274025 - ANTENNA AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Dong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jiaming Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
XUE, Liang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
LI, Yuanpeng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Hanyang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 06 /
HOU, Meng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 21925489.3 | 10.12.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021CN137028 | Priority number, date | CN202110185331 | 10.02.2021 Original published format: CN202110185331 | [2023/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022170842 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4274025 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.08.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/36, H01Q1/38, H01Q1/48, H01Q1/24, H01Q9/04, H01Q5/364, H01Q9/42, // H01Q1/22 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
H01Q9/42 (EP,US);
H01Q1/36 (CN);
H01Q5/364 (EP,US);
H01Q1/22 (EP,CN);
H01Q1/243 (EP);
H01Q1/38 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/45] | H01Q1/36, H01Q1/38, H01Q1/48, H01Q1/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | ANTENNE UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/45] | English: | ANTENNA AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/45] | French: | ANTENNE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2023 | Translation filed | 03.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]CN209487711U (UNIV NANJING FORESTRY); |