EP4097974 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONSTRUCTING A 3D GEOMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xiang Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
GAO, Wen Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
LIU, Shan Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/49] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21927034.5 | 18.10.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021US55406 | Priority number, date | US202163157519P | 05.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163157519 P | US202117501779 | 14.10.2021 Original published format: US202117501779 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022186861 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4097974 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/132, H04N19/146, H04N19/169, H04N19/597, H04N19/60, H04N19/62, H04N19/96, G06T9/00 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
G06T9/001 (EP,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,KR);
G06T17/00 (US);
G06T9/00 (KR);
G06T9/007 (EP);
H04N19/119 (EP,KR);
H04N19/132 (EP);
H04N19/146 (EP);
H04N19/169 (EP);
H04N19/184 (KR);
H04N19/60 (EP);
H04N19/70 (KR);
H04N19/96 (EP);
G06T2207/10028 (KR);
G06T2210/12 (US);
G06T2210/56 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/49] | H04N19/62, G06T9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERSTELLUNG EINER 3D-GEOMETRIE | [2022/49] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONSTRUCTING A 3D GEOMETRY | [2022/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CONSTRUCTION D'UNE GÉOMÉTRIE 3D | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 05.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP4022456 (TENCENT AMERICA LLC [US]); | [E]EP4031907 (TENCENT AMERICA LLC [US]); | International search | [YA]US2019156520 (MAMMOU KHALED [CA], et al); | [A]US2019385355 (XU YI [US]); | [YA]US2020413096 (ZHANG XIANG [US], et al) |