EP4299206 - METHOD FOR MOLDING WIRE MATERIAL, DEVICE FOR MOLDING WIRE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Yoshiko Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 02 /
TOBA, Akira Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 03 /
KAWAGUCHI, Shota Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 21928020.3 | 18.10.2021 | [2024/01] | WO2021JP38485 | Priority number, date | JP20210030265 | 26.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021030265 | [2024/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022180925 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4299206 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B21F1/02 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
B21F1/026 (EP);
B21B1/18 (US);
B21F1/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FORMEN VON DRAHTMATERIAL, VORRICHTUNG ZUM FORMEN VON DRAHTMATERIAL | [2024/01] | English: | METHOD FOR MOLDING WIRE MATERIAL, DEVICE FOR MOLDING WIRE MATERIAL | [2024/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE DE MATÉRIAU DE FIL, DISPOSITIF DE MOULAGE DE MATÉRIAU DE FIL | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2023 | Translation filed | 26.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS494665 ; | [Y]JPS60151643U ; | [Y]JPS6146036U ; | [Y]JPH05104181 (BRIDGESTONE BEKAERT STEEL CODE); | [Y]JPH06246380 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2001353542 (NITTETSU STEEL PIPE CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007044734 (HITACHI CABLE, et al); | [Y]JP2016187821 (YAZAKI CORP) |