EP4306757 - BI-DIRECTIONAL DAMPER FOR SHOWER DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOSHAN IDEAL CO., LTD. No. 2 (Shashui) of Hedong Road Yanghe Town, Gaoming Foshan Guangdong 528515 / CN | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Wuxiang Foshan Guangdong 528515 / CN | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 21929599.5 | 12.03.2021 | [2024/03] | WO2021CN80346 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022188121 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4306757 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | E05F3/22, E05F5/00 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
E05F5/003 (EP);
E05F3/108 (CN);
E05F3/18 (CN);
E05F3/227 (CN);
E05Y2201/412 (EP);
E05Y2201/496 (EP);
E05Y2800/205 (EP);
E05Y2800/21 (EP);
E05Y2800/242 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/03] | E05F3/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | BIDIREKTIONALER DÄMPFER FÜR EINE DUSCHTÜR | [2024/03] | English: | BI-DIRECTIONAL DAMPER FOR SHOWER DOOR | [2024/03] | French: | AMORTISSEUR BIDIRECTIONNEL POUR PORTE DE DOUCHE | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2023 | Translation filed | 31.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP3147428U ; | [Y]CN204126451U (GUANGDONG MINGMEN LOCKS INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [A]CN104314407 (GUANGDONG MINGMEN LOCKS INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [Y]CN110520589 (FOSHAN IDEAL SANITARY WARE CO LTD) | International search | [A]JP3147428U ; | [A]US2011252596 (VOGLER THOMAS [DE]); | [Y]CN104314407 (GUANGDONG MINGMEN LOCKS INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [A]CN104340512 (HAWA AG); | [Y]CN110520589 (FOSHAN IDEAL SANITARY WARE CO LTD) |