EP4307782 - RELATIVE POSITIONING AUTHORIZATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, TERMINAL, AND TARGET DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. 1/F, Building 1, No. 5 Shangdi East Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jianxiang Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
QUAN, Haiyang Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
FU, Jing Beijing 100085 / CN | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 21929947.6 | 07.12.2021 | [2024/03] | WO2021CN136025 | Priority number, date | CN202110260387 | 10.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110260387 | [2024/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022188485 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4307782 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,CN);
H04W64/006 (US);
H04W12/06 (EP,CN);
H04W12/63 (EP);
H04W92/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR RELATIVEN POSITIONIERUNGSAUTORISIERUNG, ENDGERÄT UND ZIELVORRICHTUNG | [2024/03] | English: | RELATIVE POSITIONING AUTHORIZATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, TERMINAL, AND TARGET DEVICE | [2024/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AUTORISATION DE POSITIONNEMENT RELATIF, TERMINAL, ET DISPOSITIF CIBLE | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2023 | Translation filed | 04.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2008242316 (WANG WEN-WU [CN], et al); | [XA]WO2014007308 (NEC CORP [JP]) |