EP4306581 - POLYPROPYLENE-BASED RESIN FOAM PARTICLES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYPROPYLENE-BASED RESIN FOAM PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSP Corporation 4-2 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOHARA, Tokunobu Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0881 / JP | 02 /
ODE, Yasutaka Kanuma-shi, Tochigi 322-0014 / JP | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Wagner Albiger & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Leopold-Straße 27 53225 Bonn / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 21930410.2 | 21.12.2021 | [2024/03] | WO2021JP47426 | Priority number, date | JP20210040849 | 12.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021040849 | [2024/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022190565 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4306581 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/18, C08K5/3435 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
C08J9/0028 (EP,US);
C08J9/224 (KR,US);
C08J9/18 (EP,US);
C08J9/232 (EP,US);
C08J9/365 (KR);
C08K5/3435 (KR);
C08K5/34926 (EP,US);
C08K7/22 (EP);
C08J2201/03 (EP);
C08J2201/034 (EP);
C08J2203/06 (EP);
C08J2203/22 (US);
C08J2323/12 (KR);
C08J2323/14 (US);
C08J2323/16 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L23/12 (EP);
C08K5/34926, C08L23/12 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | POLYPROPYLENBASIERTE HARZSCHAUMPARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYPROPYLENBASIERTEN HARZSCHAUMPARTIKELN | [2024/03] | English: | POLYPROPYLENE-BASED RESIN FOAM PARTICLES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYPROPYLENE-BASED RESIN FOAM PARTICLES | [2024/03] | French: | PARTICULES DE MOUSSE DE RÉSINE À BASE DE POLYPROPYLÈNE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PARTICULES DE MOUSSE DE RÉSINE À BASE DE POLYPROPYLÈNE | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2023 | Translation filed | 21.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 07.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2015107847 (JSP CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5* paragraphs [0019], [0055], [0067], [0093] *; | [Y]WO2016111017 (JSP CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0018], [0055], [0067], [0085] *; | [Y]JP2018162370 (KANEKA CORP) [Y] 1-5 * claims, paragraphs [0009], [0093], [0120]-[0127], table 1, examples * | by applicant | JP2004263033 |