EP4306644 - CORYNEBACTERIUM GLUTAMICUM VARIANT HAVING IMPROVED L-LYSINE PRODUCTION ABILITY, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING L-LYSINE BY USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CJ Cheiljedang Corporation 330, Dongho-ru Jung-gu Seoul 04560 / KR | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYU, Mi Gyeonggi-do 17384 / KR | 02 /
MOON, Min Woo Daejeon 34150 / KR | 03 /
HONG, In Pyo Gyeonggi-do 17384 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Seok Hyun Gyeonggi-do 12258 / KR | 05 /
PARK, Joon Hyun Gyeonggi-do 13523 / KR | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 21930458.1 | 30.04.2021 | [2024/03] | WO2021KR05509 | Priority number, date | KR20210030960 | 09.03.2021 Original published format: KR 20210030960 | KR20210054313 | 27.04.2021 Original published format: KR 20210054313 | [2024/03] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022191358 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4306644 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/77, C12N9/88, C12P13/08 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
C12N15/77 (EP,KR);
C12N9/88 (EP,CN,KR);
C12N15/63 (EP);
C12P13/08 (EP,CN,KR);
C12Y401/0102 (EP,CN,KR);
C12R2001/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Validation states | KH | 20.09.2023 | Title | German: | CORYNEBACTERIUM GLUTAMICUM-VARIANTE MIT VERBESSERTER L-LYSIN-PRODUKTIONSFÄHIGKEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON L-LYSIN DAMIT | [2024/03] | English: | CORYNEBACTERIUM GLUTAMICUM VARIANT HAVING IMPROVED L-LYSINE PRODUCTION ABILITY, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING L-LYSINE BY USING SAME | [2024/03] | French: | VARIANT DE CORYNEBACTERIUM GLUTAMICUM À CAPACITÉ AMÉLIORÉE DE PRODUCTION DE L-LYSINE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE L-LYSINE FAISANT APPEL À CELUI-CI | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2023 | Translation filed | 20.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 11.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]KR20080025355 (CJ CHEILJEDANG CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20130130377 (PAIK KWANG IND CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]US2020347419 (WEN TINGYI [CN], et al); | by applicant | KR100838038B | KR20200026881 | KR102139806B |