EP4107987 - A METHOD FOR RADIO ACCESS NETWORK VISIBLE QUALITY OF EXPERIENCE MEASUREMENT OF DUAL CONNECTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Zhuang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
LI, Dapeng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
GAO, Yin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21930622.2 | 31.03.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021CN84515 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022205120 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4107987 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04L41/5067 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER SICHTBAREN ERFAHRUNGSQUALITÄT VON DUALER KONNEKTIVITÄT IN EINEM FUNKZUGANGSNETZWERK | [2022/52] | English: | A METHOD FOR RADIO ACCESS NETWORK VISIBLE QUALITY OF EXPERIENCE MEASUREMENT OF DUAL CONNECTIVITY | [2022/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE QUALITÉ D'EXPÉRIENCE VISIBLE DE RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS RADIO DE CONNECTIVITÉ DOUBLE | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 05.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]CN111432419 (ZTE CORP); | [XYI]WO2020151731 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [A]CN112533227 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [T]EP3910987 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [T]EP4024941 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [A]US2019230551 (VIKBERG JARI [SE], et al); | [XY]WO2020151731 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [Y]CN112351442 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN112533227 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | by applicant | CN111432419 | WO2020151731 | CN112533227 |